IL HR0100 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of Medicaid MCOs, which includes a comparison of State expenditures between MCOs and fee-for-service entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID MCOS AUDIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 94 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-31HouseResolution Adopted 094-009-000
2017-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-05HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Cost Benefit Analysis Committee; 004-001-000
2017-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cost Benefit Analysis Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-04-05HouseReported Back To Cost Benefit Analysis Committee;
2017-04-05HouseRecommends Be Adopted Subcommittee/ Cost Benefit Analysis Committee; 002-001-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cost Benefit Analysis Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-09HouseTo Analytics Subcommittee
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Cost Benefit Analysis Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback