IL HR0097 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 2021 as Child Abuse Prevention Month.
Title
CHILD ABUSE PREVENTION MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=97&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0097.htm |