IL HR0088 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the General Assembly to enact legislation to amend The School Code of Illinois, requiring the Illinois State Board of Education to establish criteria, standards, and competencies to be required of qualified bilingual language interpreters for parents of limited English proficiency participating in IEP meetings.
Title
IEP BI-LINGUAL INTERPRETERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=88&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0088.htm |