IL HR0050 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Condemns restrictive speech policies at institutions of higher education and urges those institutions with such policies in place to reverse their decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-FREEDOM OF SPEECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseRecommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback