IL HR0021 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes that Myalgic Encephalomyelitis (ME) is a tragic, disabling disease that destroys the lives of many patients and takes a severe toll on their families, friends, and caretakers. Recognizes and affirms the commitment of Illinois to improving the availability and quality of medical and supportive care for ME patients. Recommends that the National Institutes of Health fund ME research at a level commensurate with similarly burdensome disease. Encourages universities in Illinois to focus research attention on this underserved disease. Recommends that the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention disseminate new ME medical education, updated in accordance with the National Academy of Medicine recommendations, the recommendations of the United States Department of Health and Human Services' CFS Advisory Committee, and the best practices of disease experts. Encourages media organizations to inform the public about the seriousness of the disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHRONIC FATIGUE SYNDROME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseResolution Adopted
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-23HouseRecommends Be Adopted Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-01-04HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback