IL HR0014 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois State Board of Education to review existing data reporting mandates, both State and federal, in an effort to streamline the reporting system and remove redundant data collection.
Title
SCHOOL REPORTING-REVIEW
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] |
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution Adopted 099-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-16 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day |
2021-04-15 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |