IL HR0010 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages the State Board of Education to stop using edTPA as the teacher certification for licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE BOARD OF ED-NO EDTPA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseResolution Adopted
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-02-20HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-12-12HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback