IL HR0009 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the House Education Funding Advisory Committee to conduct a thorough review of the existing distribution methods and expenditures of education funding and make recommendations to implement an education funding system.
Title
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2015-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2015-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-01-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-01-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-01-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=9&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0009.htm |