IL HR0008 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the 16th of every month in 2013 and 2014 as Premature Birth Prevention and Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
PREMATURE BIRTH PREVENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2013-02-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=8&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0008.htm |