IL HJRCA0062 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-14)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a bill passed on or after the date of a general election but on or before the second Wednesday of January following the general election that would result in the increase of revenue to the State by an increase of a tax on or measured by income or the selling price of any item of tangible personal property or any service may become law only with the concurrence of three-fifths of the members elected to each house of the General Assembly.
Title
CONAMEND-REVENUE BILLS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - House - Amendment in House (Y: 84 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-12-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-018-002 |
2016-12-01 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-12-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-12-01 | House | Read in Full a Third Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-30 | House | Read in Full a Second Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000 |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-11-29 | House | (M1) Motion to Suspend Rule 21 and Rule 46 - Prevailed |
2016-11-29 | House | (M1) Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee and Rule 46: Representative Jack Franks |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-11-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-11-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |