IL HJRCA0057 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend Section 1 of Article X of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a fundamental right (instead of goal) of the People of the State is the educational development of all persons to the limits of their capacities. Provides that it is the paramount duty of the State to provide for a thorough and efficient system of high quality public education institutions and services and to guarantee equality of educational opportunity as a fundamental right of each citizen (instead of requiring the State to provide for an efficient system of high quality public education institutions and services). Provides that the State has the preponderant financial responsibility (instead of the primary responsibility) for financing the system of public education. Effective upon being declared adopted in accordance with Section 7 of the Illinois Constitutional Amendment Act.
Title
CON AMEND-EDUCATION FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Read in Full a Third Time |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-18 | House | Read in Full a Second Time |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-004-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-11 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2016-04-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |