IL HJRCA0057 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-02 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-02 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Judiciary Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a person must have been a licensed attorney-at-law for a minimum of ten years to be eligible to serve as a Circuit Judge, a minimum of twelve years to be eligible to serve as an Appellate Judge, and a minimum of fifteen years to be eligible to serve as a Supreme Court Judge, except that a person serving as a Judge on December 31, 2010 is not disqualified from completing the current term of office or seeking an additional term. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-JUDICIAL ELIGIBLITY
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. John Fritchey [D] |
Rep. Careen Gordon [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Michael Madigan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-02 | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 | |
2010-03-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-03-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-03-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed | |
2010-03-23 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-03-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2010-03-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-22 | Read in Full a Third Time | |
2010-03-17 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Read in Full a Second Time | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-16 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Read in Full a First Time | |
2010-02-22 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=57&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJRCA/09600HC0057.htm |