IL HJRCA0044 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution concerning the passage of revenue bills. Provides that any bill resulting in the increase of revenue to the State by an increase of a tax on or measured by income or by an increase of a tax on or measured by the selling price of any item of tangible personal property may become law only by a vote of three-fifths of the members in each house of the General Assembly. Effective on being declared adopted in accordance with Section 7 of the Illinois Constitutional Amendment Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TAX INCREASE BILL 3/5 MAJORITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-05HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 46
2012-04-18HouseMotion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 060-051-000
2012-04-18HouseShall the Chair be Sustained
2012-04-18HouseAppeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
2012-04-18HouseChair Rules Motion Out of Order
2012-04-18HouseAppeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
2012-04-18HouseMotion Discharge Committee Lost
2012-04-18HouseChair Rules Motion Lost
2012-04-18HouseObjects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2012-04-18HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. David Harris
2012-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2012-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer
2012-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans
2012-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2012-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond
2012-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2012-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole
2012-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger
2012-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
2012-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland
2012-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2012-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
2012-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher
2012-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2012-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay
2012-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-16HouseRead in Full a First Time
2012-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ren

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback