IL HJRCA0033 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Suffrage and Elections Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the General Assembly may by law provide for the right to vote of a person convicted of a felony, or otherwise under sentence in a correctional institution or jail, but in any event the right to vote shall be restored not later than upon completion of his or her sentence. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-FELON VOTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2019-05-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |