IL HJRCA0028 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-02 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-02 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution concerning the passage of revenue bills. Provides that any bill resulting in the increase of revenue to the State by an increase of a tax on or measured by income or by an increase of a tax on or measured by the selling price of any item of tangible personal property may become law only by a vote of three-fifths of the members in each house of the General Assembly. Effective on being declared adopted in accordance with Section 7 of the Illinois Constitutional Amendment Act.
Title
TAX INCREASE BILL 3/5 MAJORITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-02 | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 | |
2009-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-29 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 069-048-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2009-04-29 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-04-29 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2009-04-29 | Chair Rules Motion Out of Order | |
2009-04-29 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-04-29 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-03-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-03-02 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Read in Full a First Time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=28&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJRCA/09600HC0028.htm |