IL HJRCA0027 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-18 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bradley Stephens
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-18 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bradley Stephens
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Finance Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that expenditures shall not exceed proposed revenue (rather than funds) estimated to be available for a fiscal year. Provides that except for deficiency or emergency appropriations, all appropriations are expendable only during the fiscal year for which they were appropriated. Provides that no public money shall be expended except as provided by appropriations made by law. Provides that expenditures for any fiscal year shall not exceed the State's revenues and reserves, including proceeds of any debt obligation, for that year. Provides that no debt obligation, except as shall be repaid within the fiscal year of issuance, shall be authorized for the current operation of any State service or program, nor shall the proceeds of any debt obligation be expended for a purpose other than that for which it was authorized. Provides that any law requiring the expenditure of State funds shall be null and void unless, during the session in which the act receives final passage, an appropriation is made for the estimated first-year's funding. Defines "revenue". Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-STATE FINANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=27&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJRCA/10100HC0027.htm |