IL HJRCA0026 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature and Revenue Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the General Assembly may increase the rate of an existing tax or impose a new tax only by a law approved by the vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Provides that the General Assembly may override the veto of the Governor of a bill to increase the rate of an existing tax or impose a new tax only by a record vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-TAX-2/3RDS VOTE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback