IL HJRCA0014 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Limits a person's total service in the office of Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House, or Minority Leader of the Senate to a total of 8 years in any one office and 12 years combined in 2 or more offices. Effective upon being declared adopted and applies to service on or after the second Wednesday in January, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEGISLATURE-OFFICER LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback