IL HJRCA0013 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Prohibits a person from holding the office of State Senator or State Representative, or a combination of those offices, for more than 10 years. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
GA MEMBERS-TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=13&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJRCA/10200HC0013.htm |