IL HJRCA0001 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Prohibits a person from serving as a State Representative for more than 3 terms of office that begin on or after the date that the Constitutional Amendment is declared adopted. Prohibits a person from serving as a State Senator for more than 3 terms of office that begin on or after the date that the Constitutional Amendment is declared adopted. Applies to the election of General Assembly members in the first general election to occur after the Amendment is declared adopted and thereafter. Specifies that it does not affect the terms of members elected before the amendment is declared adopted. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-GA TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJRCA/10200HC0001.htm |