IL HJR0150 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-09 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-09 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Statewide Task Force on Disconnected Youth in order to examine and develop ways to address the growing number of disconnected youth who are out of school and jobless in Illinois.
Title
DISCONNECTED YOUTH TSK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-11-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-31 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 116-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Youth & Young Adults; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Youth & Young Adults |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-05-23 | House | Assigned to Youth & Young Adults |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |