IL HJR0147 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-10 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the section of 9th Street between the intersection of East Converse Street and East Ridgely Street in Springfield as the "Officer David Tapscott Memorial Street".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DAVID TAPSCOTT MEM STREET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-10 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-10HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-01-10SenateResolution Adopted; 057-000-000
2017-01-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions January 10, 2017
2017-01-10SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2016-07-31SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2016-06-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2016-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2016
2016-05-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2016-05-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-05-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2016-05-25SenateArrive in Senate
2016-05-25HouseResolution Adopted 116-000-000
2016-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2016-05-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 020-000-000
2016-05-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2016-05-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2016-05-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2016-05-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2016-05-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2016-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-05-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback