IL HJR0134 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-NINTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, March 03, 2016, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Monday, April 04, 2016, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 08, 2016, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, March 09, 2016, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, March 10, 2016, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, March 16, 2016, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, March 17, 2016, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Friday, March 18, 2016, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 5, 2016, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.; 3-6(a) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-03-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |