IL HJR0127 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November 1, 2018 as "Vietnam Veterans Recognition Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
VIETNAM VETS RECOGNITION DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=127&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0127.htm |