IL HJR0124 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth the amounts of general funds estimated by the Illinois Senate to be available during State fiscal year 2019.
Title
FY19 SENATE REVENUE ESTIMATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=124&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0124.htm |