IL HJR0117 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority and the Illinois Department of Transportation to rename the I-355/I-290 Interchange near Itasca as the Trooper John Kugelman Memorial Interchange.
Title
TROOPER KUGELMAN INTERCHANGE
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Edward Acevedo [D] | Rep. John Anthony [R] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-11 | House | Resolution Adopted 115-000-000 |
2016-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-04-21 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 016-000-000 |
2016-04-15 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |