IL HJR0114 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the segment of Illinois Route 121 in Cumberland County between CR 1450 East and CR 1600 East as the "SPC Michael Flood Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPC. M. FLOOD MEMORIAL HGHWY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-10SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted 110-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-03-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback