IL HJR0112 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Rural Broadband Deployment Task Force to assess the rural telecommunications infrastructure of the State of Illinois for the purpose of determining the present and future needs of the State with respect to realizing the goals of competition, affordability, universal service, and securing the State's telecommunications and economic future.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RURAL BROADBAND TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback