IL HJR0101 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
BE IT RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that the two Houses shall convene in Joint Session on Wednesday, February 14, 2018 at the hour of 12:00 o'clock noon for the purpose of hearing Governor Bruce Rauner present to the General Assembly his Budget Message for the Fiscal Year 2019, as required by Chapter 15, Section 20/50-5 of the Illinois Compiled Statutes.
Title
JOINT SESSION-BUDGET MESSAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Terry Link; 3-6(a) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=101&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0101.htm |