IL HJR0092 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the passage of the legislation before the 116th U.S. Congress that would eliminate co-pays for preventive procedures and medication for those treated through the Veterans Administration.
Title
VETERANS-NO CO-PAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-02-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 015-000-000 |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=92&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0092.htm |