IL HJR0090 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urges recognition of Illinois' vibrant history of African American political struggles for democracy and freedom that have widened the scope and deepened the State's and United States' commitment to democracy and racial justice. Urges adequate appropriations for investigations, research, publication, and a website to represent Illinois' contribution to widening and deepening the State's and the United States' commitment to racial justice in memorializing Illinois Recognition of the 1619 Project:Year of Return. Urges adequate appropriations for the development of a comprehensive legislative agenda of policies and pending racial justice legislation for engagement with the State's African American stakeholders to memorialize the 1619-2019 Year of Return.
Title
1619-2019 YEAR OF RETURN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-11-13 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2019-11-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-11-12 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-11-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-11-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-11-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-11-06 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |