IL HJR0082 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-30 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-30 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Black Immigrants to study the state of Black immigrants in Illinois and provide recommendations on how to assist them.
Title
BLACK IMMIGRANTS TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Sen. Lakesia Collins [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Cyril Nichols [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |