IL HJR0082 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-13 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-13 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-SIXTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Wednesday, January 13, 2010, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Friday, January 15, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, January 21, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, January 25, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Friday, January 29, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, February 1, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 03, 2010, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Thursday, January 21, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, January 28, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 03, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, February 08, 2010, at 5:00 o'clock p.m., or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-13 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2010-01-13 | Resolution Adopted | |
2010-01-13 | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) | |
2010-01-13 | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Don Harmon; 3-6(a) | |
2010-01-13 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2010-01-13 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-01-13 | Resolution Adopted | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=82&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJR/09600HJ0082.htm |