IL HJR0081 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the Armor Road Overpass in the City of Bradley as the "Sgt. Wilford Ray "Wil" Lewis Memorial Overpass".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SGT. WILL LEWIS OVERPASS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateBe Adopted Transportation; 012-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-01HouseResolution Adopted 101-000-000
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-02-13HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-000-000
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback