IL HJR0081 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Illinois Route 149 East from U.S. Route 51 to the Jackson County Line as the "Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
VETERANS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 052-000-000 |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions August 4, 2015 |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 110-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 017-000-000 |
2015-05-29 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-29 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-05-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=81&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0081.htm |