IL HJR0072 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-SEVENTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two houses adjourn on Thursday, March 1, 2012, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 6, 2012, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 6, 2012 at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-03-01 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule ; 3-6(a) |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. M. Maggie Crotty; 3-6(a) |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-02-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-02-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=72&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJR/09700HJ0072.htm |