IL HJR0072 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the date of May 10, 2009 and every May 10 thereafter as "Osteoporosis Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
OSTEOPOROSIS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2010-03-11 | Resolution Adopted | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Be Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000 | |
2010-02-11 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2010-01-13 | Re-assigned to Public Health | |
2009-11-30 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-29 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-10-28 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-28 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-10-28 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-10-15 | Resolution Adopted as Amended | |
2009-10-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-10-13 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2009-10-13 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-13 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2009-10-08 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-10-08 | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-10-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-09-22 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |