IL HJR0066 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the Frank Lloyd Wright properties that are open to the public in Illinois as part of the "Frank Lloyd Wright Trail".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FRANK LLOYD WRIGHT TRAIL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseAdopted Both Houses
2018-04-26SenateResolution Adopted
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions January 31, 2018
2018-01-30SenateBe Adopted State Government; 006-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-06-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-06-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-25HouseResolution Adopted
2017-06-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-06-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-23HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-23HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-06-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback