IL HJR0065 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-8)
Status: Passed on May 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-8)
Status: Passed on May 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Pension System Modernization Task Force to recommend pension benefit changes to modernize the Teachers' Retirement System of the State of Illinois, the State Universities Retirement System, and the State Employees' Retirement System of Illinois.
Title
PENSION SYSTM MODERNIZATION TF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-31 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2009-05-31 | Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-31 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-31 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-05-31 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-31 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-05-31 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-05-31 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-31 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-05-31 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-05-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-30 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-05-30 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-05-30 | Resolution Adopted as Amended 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-05-30 | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Personnel and Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-05-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-05-29 | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-29 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Personnel and Pensions Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-05-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-05-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-05-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-05-29 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-05-29 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-28 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy |