IL HJR0062 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Illinois Office of Tourism to do a feasibility study on linking together the Annbriar Golf Course in Waterloo, Gateway National in Madison, Governors Run in Carlyle, Kokopelli in Marion, Rend Lake Golf Resort in Whittington, Stone Creek Golf Club in Urbana, and Stonewolf Golf Club in Fairview Heights into the Abraham Lincoln Golf Trail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A. LINCOLN GOLF TRAIL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateResolution Adopted
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateBe Adopted Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2018-01-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-07-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-06-27SenateSponsor Removed Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-06-27SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-06-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-06-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-06-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-06-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-06-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-06-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-06-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-25HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-30HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-29HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-29HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-05-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback