IL HJR0062 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Office of Tourism to do a feasibility study on linking together the Annbriar Golf Course in Waterloo, Gateway National in Madison, Governors Run in Carlyle, Kokopelli in Marion, Rend Lake Golf Resort in Whittington, Stone Creek Golf Club in Urbana, and Stonewolf Golf Club in Fairview Heights into the Abraham Lincoln Golf Trail.
Title
A. LINCOLN GOLF TRAIL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Be Adopted Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-06-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-05-29 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-29 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=62&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0062.htm |