IL HJR0061 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Addressing the Illinois Teacher Shortage Task Force whose purpose is the following: (1) to obtain and analyze data on the teacher shortage, including how the COVID-19 pandemic has exacerbated the shortage, (2) to audit Illinois' teacher licensure laws and rules to determine if any laws or rules are an impediment to quality teachers joining the classroom, (3) to study and review required examinations for student teachers as well as professional development requirements for existing teachers, and (4) to provide recommendations on how to address the teacher shortage by removing impediments in current laws and rules.
Title
TEACHER SHORTAGE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |