IL HJR0061 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Illinois Route 6 starting at the eastern village limits of Hollowayville to Ladd Junction, Illinois Route 6 and Illinois route 89, going through Seatonville as the "Galetti Brothers Memorial Highway."
Title
GALETTI BROS MEM HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted 117-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |