IL HJR0061 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to research programs of identification and training for therapy dogs, especially therapy dogs designated for veterans, and provide a report to the General Assembly on possibilities for legislation to provide a certification program for therapy dogs in the State of Illinois.
Title
VETERANS - THERAPY DOGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Postponed - Veterans Affairs |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-06-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-06-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Veterans' Affairs Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-06-23 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=61&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0061.htm |