IL HJR0061 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-SIXTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Friday, May 22, 2009, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 26, 2009 at 12:00 o'clock noon; and when the Senate adjourns on Saturday, May 23, 2009, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 26, 2009 at 12:00 o'clock noon.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-05-22 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=61&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJR/09600HJ0061.htm |