IL HJR0059 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the International Cybersecurity Task Force within the Illinois Commerce Commission to review the Joint Analysis Report from the U.S. Department of Homeland Security and the Federal Bureau of Investigation dated December 29, 2016 and entitled "Grizzly Steppe - Russian Malicious Cyber Activity" and develop strategies to either implement or reject the report recommendations.
Title
CYBERSECURITY TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Keith Sommer [R] |
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 047-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-06-22 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 095-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2017-05-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-05-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-05-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |