IL HJR0056 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-29 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-29 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Illinois Route 1 from Wichert Road to St. Anne as the "Honorary Jack Sikma Road".
Title
HONORARY JACK SIKMA ROAD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2022-03-09 | House | Resolution Adopted 109-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-02-10 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |