IL HJR0054 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolves that the Board of Higher Education, working in concert with the Illinois Student Assistance Commission and the Illinois Community College Board, shall undertake a study of college affordability and funding.
Title
IBHE-COLLEGE AFFORDABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-29 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-29 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2009-10-29 | Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000 | |
2009-10-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions October 29, 2009 | |
2009-10-28 | Be Adopted Higher Education; 008-000-000 | |
2009-10-15 | Assigned to Higher Education | |
2009-10-14 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-14 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2009-10-14 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Resolution Adopted 116-000-000 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-05-27 | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-30 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |