IL HJR0049 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States the estimated revenues available for the 2018 Fiscal Year budget based on an assessment by the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FY18 HOUSE REVENUE ESTIMATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-04-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback