IL HJR0046 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the portion of Roosevelt Road from Cicero Avenue to Austin Avenue in Chicago as "Muhammad Ali Road".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUHAMMAD ALI ROAD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-04 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-04HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-07-04SenateResolution Adopted; 050-000-000
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-06-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions July 1, 2017
2017-06-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-06-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-06-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted 088-000-000
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-16HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback